skip to content

AUJLA, Ramandeep Singh

CPSO#: 85812

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prime Urgent Care Clinic
Unit F1
7070 McLaughlin Road
Mississauga ON  L5W 1W7
Phone: (905) 795-2873
Fax: (905) 795-9114 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Aujla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. AUJLA ( CPSO# 85812 )

Business Address:
7070 McLaughlin Road
Unit F1
Mississauga ON  L5W 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 795-2873

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMANDEEP SINGH AUJLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUJLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009