skip to content

Zaman-Haque, Abeyat

CPSO#: 98500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Zaman, Abeyat (used until: 24 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 219
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 696-0003
Fax: (416) 696-0022 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 503
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-4294
Fax: (416) 226-1928
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Zaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaman ( CPSO# 90195 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )
Dr. N. Zaman ( CPSO# 103331)

Business Address:
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 984-6172


Corporation Name: Dr. Nihal Haque and Dr. Abeyat Zaman-Haque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Haque ( CPSO# 98064 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )

Business Address:
503-1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 226-4294

Business Address:
Senior's Health Centre Clinic
2 Buchan Court
North York ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-6050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABEYAT ZAMAN-HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN-HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017