skip to content

Yang, Adrienne Yuk-Yin

CPSO#: 109331

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Silver Star Boulevard 2nd Floor
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Phone: 4165022029
Fax: 4165028710 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 203
3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4424
Fax: (416) 490-8180
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yang W.Y. Philip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Yang ( CPSO# 30828 )
Dr. S. Yang ( CPSO# 97972 )
Dr. A. Yang ( CPSO# 109331)

Business Address:
Bridlewood Professional Centre
203 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 493-4424

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE YUK-YIN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018