skip to content

Walsh, Allyn Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30726

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 Chedoke Ave
Hamilton ON  L8P 4P2 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2022