skip to content

Vaisman, Alon

CPSO#: 95623

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Infection Prevention and Control
8 PMB 104
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3758
Fax: (416) 340-5047 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yingming Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chen ( CPSO# 95731 )
Dr. A. Vaisman ( CPSO# 95623 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Radiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Infection Prevention and Control
8 PMB 104
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3758

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALON VAISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015