skip to content

Usher, Ann Kathryn

CPSO#: 26490

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Names: Usher-Owen, Ann Kathryn (used until: 06 Nov 1997 )     Usher-Boyd, Ann Kathryn (used until: 09 May 1994 )     Boyd, Ann Kathryn Usher (used until: 20 Mar 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
B2424- 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8338
Fax: (519) 685-8080 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. K. Usher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Usher ( CPSO# 26490 )
Dr. T. Boyd ( CPSO# 90462 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus - Room B2424
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANN KATHRYN USHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974