skip to content

Toguri, Allan Goro

CPSO#: 22871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-8913
Fax: (416) 439-0784 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
2025 Midland Ave
M1P 3E2
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: 416-296-1911
Fax: 416-296-1910
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Toguri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Toguri ( CPSO# 103708)
Dr. A. Toguri ( CPSO# 22871 )
Dr. D. Toguri ( CPSO# 96418 )

Business Address:
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8913

Business Address:
200 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 296-1911


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN GORO TOGURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOGURI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970