skip to content

Takhar, Amandeep

CPSO#: 93368

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4242 Dundas St W
Kingsway Medical Centre
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y6
Phone: 647-341-1321
Fax: 647-341-5585 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4242 Dundas St W
Kingsway Medical Centre
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 647-341-1321
Fax: 647-341-5585
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4146
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amandeep Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Takhar ( CPSO# 93368 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalger Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDEEP TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013