skip to content

Soon, Ah-Kooi

CPSO#: 25704

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Swatow, Taiwanese

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shawn Jay Soon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soon ( CPSO# 25704 )
Dr. S. Soon ( CPSO# 76165 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
2nd Floor
4240 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T5
Phone Number: (416) 628-4997

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 42288 128 Queen St S Mississauga, ON L5M 1K8
Date Received: 23 May 2018


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 4240 Sheppard Avenue East Scarborough, ON M1S 1T5 Fax: 416-850-4143
Date Received: 18 Jan 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018