skip to content

Seetner, Avron Ashley

CPSO#: 31409

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Ashley Seetner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Seetner ( CPSO# 31409 )

Business Address:
Suite 504
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 279-1110

Medical Records Location

Address: 504 - 89 Queensway W Misssissauga, Ontario L5B 2V2
Date Received: 07 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:18 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020