skip to content

Schreader, Alicia Gaye

CPSO#: 60866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
64 Ontario Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H9
Phone: 613 955 8942
Fax: 343 600 0081 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alicia Schreader Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schreader ( CPSO# 60866 )

Business Address:
64 Ontario Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H9
Phone Number: (613) 955-8942

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALICIA GAYE SCHREADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHREADER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990