skip to content

Rogers, Alan David

CPSO#: 104310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
D718 Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Sunnybrook Hoss Tilley Burn Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 4806100 Ext. 3769
Fax: (416) 480-4531 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alan David Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeschke ( CPSO# 92713 )
Dr. A. Rogers ( CPSO# 104310)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Ross Tilley Burn Centre
Suite D718
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:01 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Alan David Rogers may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Plastic Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Rogers holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Rogers no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rogers' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rogers' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2022.