skip to content

Rochowski, Andrzej

CPSO#: 96474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone: (613) 596-1568
Fax: (613) 596-6764 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Hematology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrzej Rochowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rochowski ( CPSO# 96474 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Business Address:
37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone Number: (613) 569-1568

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2016 Active
             Dr. Andrzej Rochowski may practise medicine independently in paediatrics. 

The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.