skip to content

Poon, Alan Hing-Lun

CPSO#: 92309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20-22
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone: 905-881-0360
Fax: 905-881-3601 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Poon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Poon ( CPSO# 92309 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAN HING-LUN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2013