skip to content

Pillai, Aiswarya

CPSO#: 108879

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2017
EXPIRY DATE
18 Jan 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chandran Pillai, Aiswarya Lekshmi Pillai (used until: 08 May 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798 5555 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Sudhakaran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. A. Pillai ( CPSO# 108879)

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AISWARYA PILLAI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PILLAI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PILLAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PILLAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PILLAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PILLAI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PILLAI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 18 Jan 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 18 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Jan 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 18 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jan 2022
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.