skip to content

Patgunarajah, Anushi

CPSO#: 99573

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Dec 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6981 Millcreek Drive
Unit 2
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5N6B8
Phone: (289) 724-7246 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

245 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON  L6K3Y6
Canada
Phone: 289-817-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

701 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: 289-768-7246
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

500 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B0S1
Canada
Phone: (905)205-1400
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Malton Urgent Care Centre
Suite 110
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 672-0479
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Dixie Urgent Care Centre
1500 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4X1L4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W6N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anushi Patgunarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patgunarajah ( CPSO# 99573 )

Business Address:
6981 Millcreek Drive
Suite 2
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone Number: (289) 724-7246

Business Address:
245 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3Y6
Phone Number: (289) 817-7246

Business Address:
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Business Address:
500 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0S1
Phone Number: (905) 205-1400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2015 Active
             Dr. Anushi Patgunarajah may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.