skip to content

Oikonomou, Anastasia

CPSO#: 76829

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Aug 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
room AG271b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 1491
Fax: (416) 480-5855 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2019
Corporation Name: Anastasia Oikonomou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite AG271b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Greece

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Anastasia Oikonomou may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which Dr. Oikonomou holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Oikonomou
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.