Nowacki, Anna Karolina (CPSO#: 86667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Van Praet & A. Nowacki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nowacki ( CPSO# 86667 )
Dr. O. Van Praet ( CPSO# 89047 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
RFE-GS-480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA KAROLINA NOWACKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWACKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012