skip to content

Marcuzzi, Alfonso

CPSO#: 30403

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marcuzzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 2425 Bloor St W Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Date Received: 26 Jul 2019


Address: Paitents who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request to: 501 - 2425 Bloor St W Toronto ON M6S 4W4 Tel: 416-767-9396
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2019