skip to content

Laronde, Aimee Louise

CPSO#: 97674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: Moore, Aimee Louise (used until: 10 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Shore Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone: 705-478-0968
Fax: 705-478-7347 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aimee Louise Laronde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laronde ( CPSO# 97674 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Northnern Shore Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone Number: (705) 478-0968

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AIMEE LOUISE LARONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARONDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014