skip to content

Lagman-Bartolome, Ana Marissa Dizon

CPSO#: 86160

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Angeles University Foundatio, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Center for Headache Clinic
76 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S1B2
Phone: (416) 3236136
Fax: 416-3236007 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Section of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-8136709
Fax: 416-8137427
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ana Marissa Lagman-Bartolome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lagman-Bartolome ( CPSO# 86160 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7427

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Centre for Headache Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6136

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANA MARISSA DIZON LAGMAN-BARTOLOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGMAN-BARTOLOME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2015