skip to content

Khoshbin, Amir

CPSO#: 91258

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 May 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Orthopedic Associates
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: 416-864-5265
Fax: 4163591601 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amir Khoshbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khoshbin ( CPSO# 91258 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 864-5265

Business Address:
St Michael's Orthopedic Associates
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5265

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIR KHOSHBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSHBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2017