skip to content

Kadri, Albert

CPSO#: 68236

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2480 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L4
Phone: (519) 946-0103
Fax: (519) 977-6690 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kadri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kadri ( CPSO# 68236 )

Business Address:
2480 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L4
Phone Number: (519) 946-0103

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 1, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 1, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (“WRH”) notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Albert Kadri’s privileges at WRH were suspended on an immediate mid-term basis, effective June 1, 2018.

On February 4, 2019, WRH provided an update to the College of its notice of June 1, 2018. The update notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Kadri has not been re-appointed to the professional staff of WRH for the 2017/2018 and 2018/2019 credentialing years and that the suspension of his privileges will continue pending Dr. Kadri exhausting his rights of appeal under the Public Hospital Act.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 13 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 18 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 07 May 2021

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Albert Kadri’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Kadri failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and that he is incompetent. It is also alleged that Dr. Kadri contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration; failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The allegations relate to Dr. Kadri’s failure to comply with an Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College; his conduct during the College’s investigation; his disruptive and unprofessional conduct in dealing with staff and administrators at a Hospital and in relation to his management of patients who were also patients at the Hospital; his inappropriate and/or unprofessional communications and/or advocacy with patients in relation to the Hospital; unprofessional conduct in relation to OHIP billing; his conduct in relation to disseminating misleading information about the Ontario Renal Network; and his conduct in relation to recruitment of a junior physician and representations made to the junior physician.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 May 2021 Active
 (1 of 3)
As from May 7, 2021, by Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Albert Kadri:

Practice Restriction and Patient Transfer of Care

(1)	Dr. Kadri shall not see patients who meet any of the following criteria (the "Criteria for Transfer"):

(a)	Patients at a very high risk of developing end-stage renal disease, including but not limited to patients who have received a blood test result showing an eGFR < 30;

(b)	Patients who have been prescribed, or require the prescription of, erythropoiesis-stimulating agents;

(c)	Patients undergoing dialysis;

(d)	Patients receiving pre-dialysis care from a Regional Renal Program.

(2)	Dr. Kadri shall not accept referrals of patients who meet any of the Criteria for Transfer;

(3)	Dr. Kadri shall complete a full transfer of care for the patients who meet any of the Criteria for Transfer, by referring these patients to the Regional Renal Program that is most appropriate for the patient. For greater clarity, Dr. Kadri shall not transfer the care of patients who meet any of the Criteria for Transfer to any physician who is not associated with a Regional Renal Program.

(4)	Dr. Kadri shall complete the transfer of care referred to in (3) above within seven (7) days of a patient first meeting the Criteria for Transfer, or more quickly if clinically necessary.

(5)	For greater clarity, in completing any transfer of care required by this Order, Dr. Kadri shall complete the transfer of care in good faith and shall personally ensure the patient is connected with a Regional Renal Program.

(6)	For greater clarity, Dr. Kadri shall fully cease to engage in any professional encounters with patients who meet any of the Criteria for Transfer after he transfers the patient's care to a Regional Renal Program and receives confirmation that the patient has been seen at the Regional Renal Program.

Patient and Referral Log

(7)	Dr. Kadri shall maintain a log in the form set out in Schedule "A", recording at least the following information (the "Patient and Referral Log"):

(a)	The name of every patient in Dr. Kadri's practice. For clarification, if a patient is referred to Dr. Kadri or added to his practice, the log will be updated immediately;

(b)	The patient's date of birth, OHIP number and chart number;

(c)	The patient's most recent eGFR and the date of that result, which shall be updated each time the result changes;

(d)	If the patient meets any of the Criteria for Transfer:

(i)	the specific Criteria for Transfer fulfilled by the patient;

(ii)	the date on which the patient first fulfilled one of the Criteria for Transfer; 

(iii)	the name of the physician and/or Regional Renal program to which the patient has been referred;

(iv)	the date of the referral.

(8)	If Dr. Kadri is required to transfer the patient as required in (1)-(6) above, Dr. Kadri shall include a note of the transfer of care referred to in 7(d) above in each patient chart.

(9)	Dr. Kadri shall submit a copy of the Patient and Referral Log to the College on a monthly basis. 

Clinical Supervision

(10)	Dr. Kadri was required to cease practice as of September 30, 2020, in accordance with the Order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee dated August 30, 2020, as he did not obtain a Clinical Supervisor as required by that Order. This constitutes a term, condition or limitation on Dr. Kadri's certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation shall continue to be included on the public register until Dr. Kadri resumes practice in accordance with the terms of this Order.

(11)	Dr. Kadri shall not resume practice except in accordance with the terms of this Order.

(12)	Prior to resuming practice, Dr. Kadri shall, at his own expense, engage a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College and shall deliver the signed Clinical Supervisor's undertaking to the College. The Clinical Supervisor's undertaking is attached at Schedule "B" to this Order.

(13)	The Clinical Supervisor shall review a minimum fifteen (15) charts per week to ensure that Dr. Kadri's assessment, on-going management and follow-up of the patient is appropriate and in order to monitor Dr. Kadri's compliance with the terms of this Order. 

(14)	At the end of each week, Dr. Kadri shall provide the Clinical Supervisor with copies of the Patient and Referral Log, his day sheets for that week and any other information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deem necessary to carry out the Clinical Supervision and/or to ensure compliance with the terms of this Order.

(15)	The patient charts reviewed by the Clinical Supervisor shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor, in consultation with the College, without input from Dr. Kadri.  If there are fewer than fifteen (15) charts available for review by the Clinical Supervisor, the Clinical Supervisor shall review all available charts.

(16)	Dr. Kadri shall fully cooperate with and abide by any recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor, including with respect to patient care, practice improvements and continuing education. For greater certainty though without limiting the foregoing, if during or after a chart review the Clinical Supervisor is of the view that any conduct or care on Dr. Kadri's part will put a patient or patients at risk of harm, Dr. Kadri shall immediately comply with any recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor to protect the patient(s) from risk of harm.

(17)	The Clinical Supervisor shall provide reports to the College at least once every two (2) weeks, or more often if the Clinical Supervisor is concerned that Dr. Kadri's patients may be exposed to harm or injury. Such reports shall be in reasonable detail, containing all information to assist the College in evaluating Dr. Kadri's standard of practice, as well as his compliance with the terms of this Order.

(18)	Dr. Kadri shall ensure that the Clinical Supervisor's Undertaking, attached at Schedule "B" to this Order, is signed and delivered to the College before he resumes practice. 

(19)	If a person who has signed an undertaking (Schedule "B" to this Order) is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its provisions, Dr. Kadri shall, within fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of the same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(20)	If Dr. Kadri does not deliver an undertaking signed by a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with (19), he shall cease practising medicine until such time as has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College and has delivered the Clinical Supervisor's signed undertaking to the College.

(21)	If Dr. Kadri is required to cease practise as a result of section (20) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

Monitoring

(22)	Prior to resuming practice, Dr. Kadri shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively his "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"). After resuming practice, he shall inform the College of each and every new Practice Location within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(23)	Dr. Kadri shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor and by staff at any location where Dr. Kadri practices to the College of all information necessary to fulfil the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and to monitor and facilitate Dr. Kadri's compliance with the Order.

(24)	Dr. Kadri shall consent to the disclosure by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, to the Chief of his department at any hospital and to the Medical Director and/or Quality Advisor of any location where he practices, of all information deemed by the College to be necessary to monitor or facilitate Dr. Kadri's compliance with the Order.

(25)	Dr. Kadri shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with the provisions of this Order.

(26)	Dr. Kadri shall cooperate fully with College representatives for the purpose of monitoring his compliance with the provisions of this Order, including but not limited to by providing College representatives with any requested documentation within specified timelines.

(27)	The College shall continue to rely on the irrevocable consent for the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, signed by Dr. Kadri on February 8, 2021 and attached at Schedule "C", to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order.
	

(2 of 3)
As from September 18, 2020, Dr. Albert Kadri has not obtained a College approved supervisor and must cease to practise until a supervisor has been obtained. 


(3 of 3)
As from August 13, 2020, by Order of the Inquires, Complaints and Reports
Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
 registration held by Dr. Albert Kadri:

Practice Restriction and Patient Transfer of Care

i.    Dr. Kadri shall not see patients who meet any of the following criteria
(the "Criteria for Transfer"):

a.    Patients at a very high risk of developing end-stage renal disease,
including but not limited to patients who have received a blood
test result showing an eGFR < 30;
                  
b.    Patients who have been prescribed, or require the prescription of,
erythropoiesis-stimulating agents;
                  
c.    Patients undergoing dialysis;
                  
d.    Patients receiving pre-dialysis care from a Regional Renal Program.
                  
ii.   Dr. Kadri shall not accept referrals of patients who meet any of the
Criteria for Transfer;

iii.  Dr. Kadri shall complete a full transfer of care for the patients who
meet any of the Criteria for Transfer, by referring these patients to the
Regional Renal Program that is most appropriate for the patient. For
greater clarity, Dr. Kadri shall not transfer the care of patients who
meet any of the Criteria for Transfer to any physician who is no
associated with a Regional Renal Program.

iv.   Dr. Kadri shall complete the transfer of care referred to in (iii) above
within seven (7) days of a patient first meeting the Criteria for
Transfer, or more quickly if clinically necessary.

v.    For patients of Dr. Kadri's who already meet the Criteria for Transfer on
the date of this Order, Dr. Kadri shall complete the transfer of care
referred to in (iii) above by September 30, 2020, or more quickly if
clinically necessary. 

vi.   For greater clarity, Dr. Kadri shall fully cease to engage in any
professional encounters with patients who meet any of the Criteria for
Transfer after he transfers the patient's care to a Regional Renal
Program and receives confirmation that the patient has been seen at the
Regional Renal Program.

Patient and Referral Log

vii.  Dr. Kadri shall maintain a log in the form set out in Schedule "A",
 recording at least the following information (the "Patient and Referral
Log"):

a.    The name of every patient who meets any of the Criteria for
 Transfer;
                  
b.    The patient's date of birth, OHIP number and chart number;
                  
c.    The specific Criteria for Transfer fulfilled by the patient;
                  
d.    The date on which the patient first fulfilled one of the Criteria
 for Transfer; 
                  
e.    The patient's most recent eGFR and the date of that result;
                  
f.    The name of the physician and/or Regional Renal program to which
the patient has been referred;
                  
g.    The date of the referral.
                  
viii. Dr. Kadri shall include a note of the transfer of care referred to in
(iii) above in each patient chart.

Clinical Supervision

ix.   Dr. Kadri shall, at his own expense, engage a Clinical Supervisor
acceptable to the College who shall review the charts of minimum ten (10)
patients per week to ensure that Dr. Kadri's assessment, on-going
management and follow-up of the patient is appropriate and in order to
monitor Dr. Kadri's compliance with the terms of this Order. The Clinical
Supervisor's undertaking is attached at Schedule "B" to this Order.

x.    At the end of each week, Dr. Kadri shall provide the supervisor with
copies of the Patient and Referral Log and his day sheets for that week.

xi.   The patient charts reviewed by the Clinical Supervisor shall be selected
by the Clinical Supervisor, in consultation with the College, without
input from Dr. Kadri. For greater clarity and without limiting the
combination of charts selected for review, the charts may include
patients listed on the Patient and Referral Log as well as patients not
listed on the Patient and Referral Log.

xii.  Dr. Kadri shall fully cooperate with and abide by any recommendations of
his Clinical Supervisor, including with respect to patient care, practice
improvements and continuing education. For greater certainty though
without limiting the foregoing, if during or after a chart review the
Clinical Supervisor is of the view that any conduct or care on Dr.
Kadri's part will put a patient or patients at risk of harm, Dr. Kadri
shall immediately comply with any recommendations made by the Clinical
Supervisor to protect the patient(s) from risk of harm.

xiii. The Clinical Supervisor shall provide reports to the College at least
once every two (2) weeks, or more often if the Clinical Supervisor is
concerned that Dr. Kadri's patients may be exposed to harm or injury.
Such reports shall be in reasonable detail, containing all information to
assist the College in evaluating Dr. Kadri's standard of practice, as
well as his compliance with the terms of this Order.

xiv.  Dr. Kadri shall ensure that the Clinical Supervisor's Undertaking,
attached at Schedule "B" to this Order, is signed and delivered to the
College by August 31, 2020. 

xv.   If a person who has signed an undertaking (Schedule "B" to this Order) is
unable or unwilling to continue to fulfil its provisions, Dr. Kadri
shall, within fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of the same, obtain
an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified
person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered
to the College within that time.

xvi.  If Dr. Kadri does not deliver an undertaking signed by a Clinical
Supervisor in accordance with (xiv) or (xv), he shall cease practising
medicine until such time as has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable
to the College and has delivered the Clinical Supervisor's signed
undertaking to the College.

xvii. If Dr. Kadri is required to cease practise as a result of section (xvi)
above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on his
certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will
be included on the public register.

Monitoring

xviii.Dr. Kadri shall, by August 14, 2020, inform the College of each and every
location at which he practises or has privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
his "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations").  Going forward, he
shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

xix.  Dr. Kadri shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor and
by staff at any location where Dr. Kadri practices to the College of all
information necessary to fulfil the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and
to monitor and facilitate Dr. Kadri's compliance with the Order.

xx.   Dr. Kadri shall consent to the disclosure by the College to his Clinical
Supervisor, to the Chief of his department at any hospital and to the
Medical Director and/or Quality Advisor of any location where he
practices, of all information deemed by the College to be necessary to
monitor or facilitate Dr. Kadri's compliance with the Order.

xxi.  Dr. Kadri shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
inspections of his Practice Locations and patient records by a College
representative for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with the
provisions of this Order.

xxii. Dr. Kadri shall cooperate fully with College representatives for the
purpose of monitoring his compliance with the provisions of this Order,
including but not limited to by providing College representatives with
any requested documentation within specified timelines.

xxiii.Dr. Kadri shall, by August 14, 2020, provide to the College his
irrevocable consent in the form attached at Schedule "C" for the College
to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, to monitor his compliance with the
terms of this Order.