skip to content

Horvath, Anna Maria Blanca

CPSO#: 25720

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Horvath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horvath ( CPSO# 25720 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
3S 376
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2022