skip to content

Hanna, Amir Kamel

CPSO#: 29091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 May 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 May 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street E
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3679
Fax: (416) 867-3654 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

906 - 2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amir Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna ( CPSO# 29091 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
6th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIR KAMEL HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1977