skip to content

Golas, Angela Christine

CPSO#: 93266

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1296 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Christine Golas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Golas ( CPSO# 93266 )

Business Address:
CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
6218 - 80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA CHRISTINE GOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015