skip to content

Elgamal, Akram Shawky

CPSO#: 69779

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
318B-395 Carrie St.
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-8392
Fax: (519) 245-8305 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1824 concession dr
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-4441
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal ( CPSO# 69779 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-8392

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:17 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AKRAM SHAWKY ELGAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 08 Feb 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998