skip to content

Coret, Alexander

CPSO#: 79859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2005
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Romanian

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34959
Fax: (905) 540-6590 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

RTM
7111 Syntex Dr
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C3
Canada
Phone: 905 362 0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medbridge Medical Services
34 Eglington Ave, Suite 316
Toronto ON  M4R 2H6
Canada
Phone: 416 993 0187
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Coret Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2015 Active
             Dr. Alexander Coret may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.