skip to content

Cooper, Alexandra Blanche

CPSO#: 91926

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Names: Nelson, Alexandra Blanche (used until: 27 Nov 2018 )     Nuttall, Alexandra Blanche (used until: 17 Jan 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone: (613) 531-2667
Fax: (613) 541-0744 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooper ( CPSO# 91926 )
Dr. M. Cooper ( CPSO# 82797 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone Number: (613) 531-2667


Corporation Name: Dr. A. B. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cooper ( CPSO# 91926 )

Business Address:
The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone Number: (613) 531-2667

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA BLANCHE COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.