skip to content

Conway, Aoife Mary

CPSO#: 61182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 457-1212 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coles-Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Conway ( CPSO# 61182 )
Dr. N. Thomas ( CPSO# 91096 )
Dr. J. Suke ( CPSO# 93397 )
Dr. B. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68028 )
Dr. S. Coles ( CPSO# 68010 )
Dr. N. Bottum ( CPSO# 55581 )
Dr. D. Gilmour ( CPSO# 100637)
Dr. C. Stephenson ( CPSO# 57052 )
Dr. K. Gammon ( CPSO# 58233 )

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7217 Gelert Road
PO Box 870
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AOIFE MARY CONWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1990