skip to content

Caudarella, Alexander

CPSO#: 97953

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Albert Street
Suite 500
Ottawa ON  K1P 5E7
Phone: 778-872-3486 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans ( CPSO# 95580 )
Dr. A. Caudarella ( CPSO# 97953 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CAUDARELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUDARELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015