skip to content

Birnbaum, Alexander

CPSO#: 31296

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Birnbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records may be obtained from Release of Information Helath Records St Joseph's Health Centre 30 The Queensway Toronto ON M6R 1B5 or Records related to prior practice at 211-2238 Dundas St W are stored by: RSRS 1-888-563-3732 ext 1
Date Received: 17 Oct 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2019