skip to content

Bali, Amardeep Kaur

CPSO#: 93296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carling Height Family Health Centre
124 Barker Street
London ON  N5Y 1Y1
Phone: 519204 2775 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 MEREDITH STREET
Gore Bay ON  P0P 1H0
Canada
Phone: 705-282-2262
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. K. Bali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMARDEEP KAUR BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014