skip to content

Baibergenova, Akerke Tulegenovna

CPSO#: 86314

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education: Kazakh State Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

M1-700 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4908
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Drive
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine Clini
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 228
Fax: (416) 222-9604
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akerke Baibergenova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baibergenova ( CPSO# 86314 )

Business Address:
401 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Business Address:
205 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-7546

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 26 Apr 2022 Active
 As from April 26, 2022 the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Akerke Tulegenovna Baibergenova in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baibergenova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. AKERKE TULEGENOVNA BAIBERGENOVA
("Dr. Baibergenova")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, certificate of registration number 86314, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-366465-J8F7S4 (the "Investigation") into my dermatology practice, including my infection prevention and control practices.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:            

1.	Medical Records Documentation, College policy;

2.	Managing Tests, College policy;

3.	Infection Prevention and Control for Clinical Office Practice Document, Public Health Ontario;

(ii)	Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module, CMPA; and

(iii)	Saegis: Successful Patient Interactions course. 

(b)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(12)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(13)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Baibergenova's dermatology practice, including her infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Baibergenova will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, communication, test results management and infection prevention and control.

(c)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Baibergenova, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 26, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Akerke Tulgenovna Baibergenova to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 26, 2022:

 

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Baibergenova’s dermatology practice, including her infection prevention and control practices. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Baibergenova will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping, communication, test results management and infection prevention and control.