skip to content

Aziz, Anis

CPSO#: 94224

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bureau 204
860 Boul Saint-René O.
Gatineau QC  J8T 8M1
Phone: (819) 525-7222
Fax: (819) 525-7111

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 335
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A2C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 575-3539
Fax: (705) 759-9333
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anis Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aziz ( CPSO# 94224 )

Business Address:
335 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 254-4364


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 07 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIS AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.