skip to content

Amer, Ali

CPSO#: 87114

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Abdul-Mhsin, Ali Amir (used until: 05 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2939 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Amer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amer ( CPSO# 87114 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2015
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.