First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |