THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:51:54 AM
Nagy, Amr Mohamed Abd Elaziz
CPSO#:
99907
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 20, 2018, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that the privileges held by Dr. Amir Nagy (Resident, PGY-5, Nephrology) were suspended by The Ottawa Hospital effective June 1, 2018.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Oct 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 19 Apr 2013
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 20 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |