skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/11/21 0:51:00 AM

Klein, David

CPSO#: 99666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Atkinson Medical Centre
531 Atkinson Ave
Unit 17
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: (905) 731-5554
Fax: (905) 709-7722 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Revital Wanono Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wanono ( CPSO# 86070 )
Dr. D. Klein ( CPSO# 99666 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
531 Atkinson Aveune
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone Number: (905) 731-5554

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2012 to 06 Feb 2013
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Aug 2013
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016