skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 09/08/22 20:05:33 PM

Nowakowski, Katarzyna

CPSO#: 99452

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westmount Family Physicians
254-785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: 226-272-0272
Fax: 519-601-6288 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Iordanous Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Iordanous ( CPSO# 93804 )
Dr. K. Nowakowski ( CPSO# 99452 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
B1 - 110
London ON  N6A 4V2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA NOWAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOWAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015