skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/10/21 19:17:35 PM

Gallo Hoyos, Andrea Ximena

CPSO#: 99262

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad El Bosque, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. DaBreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. A. Gallo Hoyos ( CPSO# 99262 )
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)
Dr. J. Ortiz Jimenez ( CPSO# 120667)

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: A. Gallo Hoyos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gallo Hoyos ( CPSO# 99262 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Apr 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Andrea Ximena Gallo Hoyos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Gallo Hoyos
                        holds an academic  appointment  at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Gallo Hoyos no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Gallo Hoyos'
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Gallo  Hoyos'
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  April  1,  2020,  and expires on June 30,
                  2023.  Upon renewal of Dr. Gallo Hoyos' academic appointment  at  Queen's
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.