THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:49:34 AM
Menon, Ranjith Krishna
CPSO#:
99195
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
14 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Medical Academy of Latvia, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Aug 2013
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2013 |