skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/07/20 1:22:11 AM

Khan, Farah Imtiaz

CPSO#: 99089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Asthma & Allergy Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918 Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active
                   Dr. Farah Imtiaz Khan may practice medicine independently in paediatrics
                  and clinical immunology and allergy, only.