THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:34:58 AM
Sethi, Baldev Raj
CPSO#:
98503
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Baldev Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact:
For patients at the Stittsville Medical Centre:
Medical Centre
1251 Main Street
Stittsville ON K2S 2E5
For patients at the Vanier Family Care Medical Centre:
Vanier Family Care Medical Centre
1237 Donald Street
Ottawa ON K1J 8W3
For patients at the Kanata Medical Centre:
Kanata Medical Centre
5357 Fernbank Road
Kanata ON K2S 1B6
Date Received: 15 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Beldev Raj Sethi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 11, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Sethi’s prescribing practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Sethi resigned from the College effective December 31, 2018, and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)