skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/09/22 18:21:31 PM

Carrier, Morgan Merie

CPSO#: 98433

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne road
Suite 105
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7312
Fax: (705) 524-7897 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury FHO Medical Clinic
1485 Bancroft drive
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6
Canada
Phone: 705-524-2221
Fax: (705) 222-3372
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705-671-1000
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Morgan Carrier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carrier ( CPSO# 98433 )

Business Address:
105-555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7312

Business Address:
1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6
Phone Number: (705) 662-8564

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MORGAN MERIE CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014