skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 13:08:46 PM

Bogler, Carolyn Talia Ackerman

CPSO#: 98412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7428 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

400-955 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: 289-357-0100
Fax: 289-357-0101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bogler and Stall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stall ( CPSO# 98019 )
Dr. C. Bogler ( CPSO# 98412 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Family Practice
3rd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN TALIA ACKERMAN BOGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014