skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 21:26:17 PM

White, David Geoffrey Benjamin

CPSO#: 98405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4-3771 Spratt Rd
Gloucester ON  K1V 2P3
Phone: 6134254213 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David G.B. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. White ( CPSO# 98405 )

Business Address:
Optimize Phsyio & Sport Medicine
4 - 3771 Spratt Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 2P3
Phone Number: (613) 425-4213

Business Address:
460 West Hunt Club
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: (613) 820-3694

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GEOFFREY BENJAMIN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015