skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/07/22 10:36:34 AM

Helmers, Andrew John

CPSO#: 98402

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6486 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN HELMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELMERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018