skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 17:54:12 PM

Penhearow, Janie Catherine

CPSO#: 98396

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ardelt medical clinic
155 Ardelt ave
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone: (519) 741-1717
Fax: (226)-475-0114 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Janie Penhearow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penhearow ( CPSO# 98396 )

Business Address:
155 Ardelt Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone Number: (519) 741-1717

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANIE CATHERINE PENHEAROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENHEAROW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015