skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 2:49:58 AM

Locke, Kirsty Catherine Isabel Amanda

CPSO#: 98393

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
111 Main Street West
North Bay, ON
P1B 2T6
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 495-6066 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRSTY CATHERINE ISABEL AMANDA LOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017